Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Ernst von Waldstein

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1716BornPraha
17 Jan 174023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Dec 174024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 May 175639.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 May 175639.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
19 Jul 175943.0SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
28 Jan 176043.5ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
19 Mar 176043.7InstalledBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
7 Dec 178973.4DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Ernst von Waldstein:
Bishop Emmanuel Ernst von Waldstein (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 49.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 81, and Page 264
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013