Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Franciscus Krejč

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Oropus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1796BornBrzeznitz
24 Aug 181923.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 185761.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
21 Dec 185761.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
28 Feb 185861.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
4 Jul 187074.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Petrus Franciscus Krejč:
Bishop Petrus Franciscus Krejč (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013