Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Brosius Horstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornTynhorschovien
23 Sep 159525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
24 Aug 162656.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
24 Aug 162656.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezus
13 Jan 164272.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Brosius Horstein:
Bishop Simon Brosius Horstein (born 1570, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 46.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015