Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miloslav Cardinal Vlk

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1932Born
23 Jun 196836.0Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
14 Feb 199057.7AppointedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
31 Mar 199057.8Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
27 Mar 199158.8AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
1 Jun 199159.0InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
26 Nov 199462.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199462.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
13 Feb 201077.7RetiredArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Mar 201784.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Miloslav Vlk (VIAF: 54951872)
Miloslav Cardinal Vlk (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLišnice - Sepekov
Death PlacePraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,863
  • d: CB, 18 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Mar 2017