Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Doubrava

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1852BornMnišek
16 Jul 187624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
22 Jun 190351.3AppointedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
29 Jun 190351.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
22 Feb 192169.0DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Doubrava:
Bishop Josef Doubrava (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013