Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Medek z Mohelnice, O. Cruc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note/Previous Titular See: O.S.Cr.de l'Etoile Rouge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538¹Born
28 Apr 158143.3AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
8 Oct 158143.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
2 Feb 159052.0DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Medek z Mohelnice (VIAF: 30924131)
Archbishop Martin Medek z Mohelnice O. Cruc. (born 1538, died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMohelnice
Ordained BishopS. Guy, Cathedral, Prague, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Death PlacePrague, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast