Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Václav Lobkowicz, O. Praem.

Bishop of Ostrava-Opava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1948 BornPlzen
15 Aug 197224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
17 Mar 199042.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Mar 199042.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
7 Apr 199042.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
30 May 199648.4AppointedBishop of Ostrava-Opava, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Václav Lobkowicz:
Bishop František Václav Lobkowicz O. Praem. (born ) Bishop of Ostrava-Opava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ostrava-Opava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,964
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Feb 2014