Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Twrdy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1715³BornBlatná
23 Dec 174126.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Feb 174226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Dec 177661.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Dec 177661.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
12 Jan 177761.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
2 Mar 177963.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Twrdy:
Bishop Franz Xaver Twrdy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 1
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015