Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dominik Jaroslav Cardinal Duka, O.P.

Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czechia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Motto: In Spiritu Veritate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1943 Born
5 Jan 196824.6EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jan 196925.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Jun 197027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jun 199855.1AppointedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czechia
26 Sep 199855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czechia
6 Nov 200461.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Litoměřice, Czechia
22 Nov 200865.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Litoměřice, Czechia
13 Feb 201066.7AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czechia
10 Apr 201066.9InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czechia
18 Feb 201268.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201268.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
25 Nov 201269.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
13 May 202279.0RetiredArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czechia

MicroData Summary
Dominik Jaroslav Duka
Dominik Jaroslav Cardinal Duka O.P.
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHradec Králové, Diocese of Hradec Králové
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Hradec Králové, Diocese of Hradec Králové

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,435
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1m13: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: CB, 9 Oct 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025