Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Mathäus Schweiberer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1711BornBezdružice
22 Mar 173826.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Apr 173826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
12 Jul 177967.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
12 Jul 177967.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
15 Aug 177967.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
27 Jun 178169.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Mathäus Schweiberer:
Bishop Johann Mathäus Schweiberer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 88, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013