Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Theodor Cardinal Innitzer

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1875Born
25 Jul 190226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
19 Sep 193256.7AppointedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
16 Oct 193256.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
31 Oct 193256.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Burgenland, Austria
13 Mar 193357.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 193357.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
12 Nov 194973.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Burgenland, Austria
9 Oct 195579.7DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Theodor Innitzer (VIAF: 41888984)
Theodor Cardinal Innitzer (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeugeschrei-Weipert, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}, Czechia
Ordained PriestWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopSankt Stephans, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Death PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Buried Place (Original)Sankt Stephans, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1932, Number 70
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Mar 1933
  • b: CB, 5 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast