Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crispin Fuk von Hradiste, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²Born
160934.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
18 Apr 164469.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Apr 164469.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezus
24 Jul 164469.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezus
23 Aug 165378.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Crispin Fuk von Hradiste
Bishop Crispin Fuk von Hradiste O. Praem. (born 1575, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlomouc

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,008
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 342
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast