Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Václav Malý

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Marcelliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1950 Born
26 Jun 197625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
3 Dec 199646.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
3 Dec 199646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcelliana
11 Jan 199746.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcelliana

MicroData Summary for Václav Malý
Bishop Václav Malý (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,889
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast