Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Graubner

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1948 BornBrno
23 Jun 197324.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 199041.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 Mar 199041.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagaria
7 Apr 199041.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagaria
28 Sep 199244.1AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Graubner:
Archbishop Jan Graubner (born ) Archbishop of Olomouc

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Olomouc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 9 Dec 2013