Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Moritz Gustav von Manderscheid-Blankenheim

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1676BornBlankenheim
18 Jun 172145.0SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
3 Aug 172145.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 172245.5ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
22 Mar 172245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
22 Jun 173357.0SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Dec 173357.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
12 Sep 173458.2InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
26 Oct 176387.3DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Moritz Gustav von Manderscheid-Blankenheim:
Archbishop Johann Moritz Gustav von Manderscheid-Blankenheim (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015