Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop František Kordač

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1852Born
15 Jun 187826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
16 Sep 191967.6AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
26 Oct 191967.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
21 Jul 193179.5RetiredArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
21 Jul 193179.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
25 Apr 193482.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Kordač
Archbishop František Kordač (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeletice

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 61
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast