Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Baxant

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1948 Born
23 Jun 197324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
4 Oct 200859.9AppointedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
22 Nov 200860.1Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Baxant
Bishop Jan Baxant (born ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlovy Vary

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Litoměřice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,989
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast