Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles von Lamberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

Grand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star


Events

DateEventTitle
14 May 1607AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 May 1607AppointedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
7 Oct 1607Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Sep 1612DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Charles von Lamberg:
Archbishop Charles von Lamberg (died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015