Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Kindermann von Schulstein

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1740³Born
22 Dec 176424.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
3 Mar 176524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
4 Feb 179049.3SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
29 Mar 179049.5ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
4 Jul 179049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
25 May 180160.6DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Kindermann von Schulstein
Bishop Ferdinand Kindermann von Schulstein (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrßlovstvÝ, Diocese of Litoměřice
Ordained BishopPraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1790, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,696
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Sep 2020

Quantcast