Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ernst Adalbert Cardinal von Harrach zu Rohrau

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1598BornWien
162122.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 162224.0SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
9 Jan 162324.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
22 Jan 162324.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 Jan 162627.2Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jun 163233.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
13 Jul 164445.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
11 Nov 166567.0AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
18 Jul 166768.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
25 Oct 166769.0DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Ernst Adalbert von Harrach zu Rohrau:
Ernst Adalbert Cardinal von Harrach zu Rohrau (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
  • a cardinal for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288, and Page 344
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 79, Number 467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015