Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Reinhold Andrimont, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625BornAndrimont
9 Sep 166944.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
9 Sep 166944.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
29 Jun 167045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
22 Nov 167449.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Otto Reinhold Andrimont:
Bishop Otto Reinhold Andrimont O.S.A. , Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 185
  • b/c2+: CB, 29 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013