Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Radkovský

Bishop of Plzeň


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1939 BornTrešt
27 Jun 197030.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 199050.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Mar 199050.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aggar
7 Apr 199050.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aggar
31 May 199353.7AppointedBishop of Plzeň, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Radkovský:
Bishop František Radkovský (born ) Bishop of Plzeň

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Plzeň.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Feb 2014