Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erasmus Dionys Krieger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1738BornMasov
14 Feb 176122.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Mar 176123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Sep 178143.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Sep 178143.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
28 Oct 178143.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
27 Dec 179254.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Erasmus Dionys Krieger
Bishop Erasmus Dionys Krieger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 23
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 407, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016