Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Václav (Wenzel) Léopold von Chlumčansky

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1749BornHošticích
19 Dec 177223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
1 Jun 179545.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
1 Jun 179545.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
28 Sep 179545.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
15 Oct 180151.9SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
29 Mar 180252.4ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
30 Jun 180252.6InstalledBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
30 Dec 181465.1SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Mar 181565.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 May 181565.5InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 Jun 183080.6DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Václav (Wenzel) Léopold von Chlumčansky:
Archbishop Václav (Wenzel) Léopold von Chlumčansky (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 242, and Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013