Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zdeněk Wasserbauer

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Buthrotum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1966 Born
2 Jan 199629.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
30 Sep 199630.2Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Jan 201851.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Jan 201851.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Buthrotum
19 May 201851.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buthrotum

MicroData Summary for Zdeněk Wasserbauer (VIAF: 84052551)
Bishop Zdeněk Wasserbauer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNové Město na Moravě, Diocese of Hradec Králové
Ordained BishopCathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2018
  • od/c1: CB, 23 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 10 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast