Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lev Cardinal Skrbenský z Hřiště

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Olomouc

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1863BornHausdorf
7 Jul 188926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Dec 189936.5AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Jan 190036.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 Jan 190036.6InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Apr 190137.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 190239.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
18 Jan 191652.6SelectedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 May 191652.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
6 Jul 192057.1RetiredArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
24 Dec 193875.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Lev Skrbenský z Hřiště:
Cardinal Lev Skrbenský z Hřiště (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Olomouc

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
  • a cardinal for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 469, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013