Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Jenstein

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1347¹Born
4 Jul 137527.5AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
19 Mar 137931.2AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Jun 140052.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Jenstein (VIAF: 88990550)
Archbishop Johann von Jenstein (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 345, and Page 408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016