Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Corti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹BornPavia
1617²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 165461.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
22 Jun 165461.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastea
6 Sep 165461.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastea
30 Mar 166269.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Corti:
Archbishop Giuseppe Corti (born 1593, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 40
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 17,009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015