Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Herbst, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Siccesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1943 Born
23 Jun 197329.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Feb 200258.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 Feb 200258.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Siccesi
6 Apr 200258.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siccesi
1 Dec 201673.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karel Herbst (VIAF: 61360325)
Bishop Karel Herbst S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrague

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,163
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast