Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wilhelm Florentin von Salm-Salm

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1745BornAnholt
13 Dec 176722.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Strasbourg, France
17 Mar 177125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
30 Jan 177630.7SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
20 May 177631.0ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
14 Jul 177631.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
1 May 179347.9SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Sep 179348.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
2 May 179448.9InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 Sep 181065.3DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Florentin von Salm-Salm:
Archbishop Wilhelm Florentin von Salm-Salm (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 348, and Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016