Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrzej Alojzy Ankwicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1777Born
26 Aug 181033.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
2 Sep 181033.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 May 181436.9SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Mar 181537.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Aug 181538.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
29 Oct 181538.3InstalledArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
31 May 183355.9SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
30 Sep 183356.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Feb 183456.6InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
26 Mar 183860.7DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Alojzy Ankwicz (VIAF: 169389551)
Archbishop Andrzej Alojzy Ankwicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków, Poland
Ordained BishopSaints Pierre et Paul, Cathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,370
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 236, and Page 314
  • c1/odd/opd/i: CB, 15 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Nov 2017