Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Vitus Nastoupil (Nastaupill, Hapstampsel)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Constantina


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Nov 1649Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 1664AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Dec 1664AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantina
31 May 1665Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantina
21 Nov 1665DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Daniel Vitus Nastoupil (Nastaupill, Hapstampsel):
Bishop Daniel Vitus Nastoupil (Nastaupill, Hapstampsel) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 162
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013