Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Prokop von Schaffgotsch

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1748Born
30 Mar 177122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
25 May 177123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
20 Dec 178436.5SelectedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
26 Sep 178537.3ConfirmedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
11 Dec 178537.5Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
8 May 181364.9DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Prokop von Schaffgotsch
Bishop Johann Prokop von Schaffgotsch (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast