Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek de Paula Pišték (Pisztek)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1786BornPřiče
7 Aug 180822.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Aug 180822.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 182438.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
27 Sep 182438.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
14 Nov 182438.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
25 Oct 183145.6SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
24 Feb 183245.9ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
10 Jun 183246.2InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
24 Jul 183549.3SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
1 Feb 183649.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
1 Feb 184659.8DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Franciszek de Paula Pišték (Pisztek):
Bishop Franciszek de Paula Pišték (Pisztek) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,525
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 101, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013