Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Joseph Mayern

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1656BornWartenberg
26 Mar 167822.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Dec 167822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Apr 171155.2SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Mar 171256.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Mar 171256.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
9 Oct 171256.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
5 Nov 173175.8SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 May 173276.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
7 Sep 173276.6InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
10 Apr 173377.2DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Mayern:
Archbishop Daniel Joseph Mayern (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015