Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Josef Cardinal Beran

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1888BornPlzen
10 Jun 191122.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 194657.8AppointedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
8 Dec 194657.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
22 Feb 196576.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196576.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia
17 May 196980.4DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Beran:
Cardinal Josef Beran (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 105
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013