Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent XI

Bl. Benedetto Odescalchi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1611BornComo
6 Mar 164533.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 164533.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
22 Jan 164735.7AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
4 Apr 165038.9AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
29 Jan 165139.7Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
6 Mar 165644.8ResignedBishop of Novara, Italy
21 Apr 165947.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
21 Sep 167665.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Oct 167665.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Aug 168978.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Oct 1956Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Benedetto Odescalchi:
Holy Father Bl. Benedetto Odescalchi (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 38.5 years
  • a cardinal for 31.6 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013