Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement XIV

Lorenzo (Giovanni Vincenzo Antonio) Ganganelli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1705BornSant' Arcangelo di Romagna
18 May 172418.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Sep 175953.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175954.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
29 Mar 176256.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
19 May 176963.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 May 176963.5Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Jun 176963.5InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Sep 177468.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo (Giovanni Vincenzo Antonio) Ganganelli:
Pope Lorenzo (Giovanni Vincenzo Antonio) Ganganelli O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015