Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Hadrian IV

Nicholas Breakspear

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Can. Reg. of Saint-Ruf of Avignon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1100¹Born
1146²46.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
1146²46.0Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 115454.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
5 Dec 115454.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Sep 115959.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Breakspear
Pope Nicholas Breakspear (born 1100, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBedmond, Great Britain

  • a cardinal for 8.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast