Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Callistus II

Guy de Bourgogne

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateEventTitle
1088²AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
2 Feb 1119ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Feb 1119InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
13 Dec 1124DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guy de Bourgogne:
Holy Father Guy de Bourgogne (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a pope for 5.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014