Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Sylvester III

Giovanni

Deceased

Pope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1000¹Born
104444.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
13 Jan 1045³45.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Mar 104545.1RemovedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
Oct 106363.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (VIAF: 66823100)
Pope Giovanni (born 1000, died Oct 1063) Pope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a pope for .1 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Mar 2017