Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius VII

Barnaba (Gregorio) Chiaramonti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1742BornCesena
20 Aug 175816.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Sep 176523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 178240.3AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
21 Dec 178240.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
14 Feb 178542.5AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
14 Feb 178542.5Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 178542.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
14 Mar 180057.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
21 Mar 180057.6InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Mar 181673.5ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
20 Aug 182381.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Barnaba (Gregorio) Chiaramonti
Pope Barnaba (Gregorio) Chiaramonti O.S.B. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
  • a cardinal for 15.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016