Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Eugene IV

Gabriele Condulmer, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1383¹BornVenice
30 Dec 140724.9AppointedBishop of Siena, Italy
1408²25.0Ordained BishopBishop of Siena, Italy
9 May 140825.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 May 140825.3ResignedBishop of Siena, Italy
9 May 140825.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
142643.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
3 Mar 143148.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
11 Mar 143148.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
23 Feb 144764.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Condulmer:
Pope Gabriele Condulmer C.R.S.A. (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 39.1 years
  • a cardinal for 22.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 May 1408
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,198
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014