Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Francis

Jorge Mario Bergoglio, S.J.

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1936 Born
11 Mar 195821.2EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
12 Mar 196023.2First VowsMember of Society of Jesus
13 Dec 196932.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Apr 197336.3Final VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
20 May 199255.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 May 199255.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Auca
27 Jun 199255.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auca
3 Jun 199760.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 Feb 199861.1SucceededArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Nov 199861.9AppointedBishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
21 Feb 200164.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200164.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino
14 Oct 200164.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino
13 Mar 201376.2ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Mar 201376.2InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Jorge Mario Bergoglio (VIAF: 68559410)
Pope Jorge Mario Bergoglio S.J. (born ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlores neighborhood, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained PriestColegio Máximo de San Miguel, Chapel, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Please contact the Pope through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,782
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Jul 2017