Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Honorius III

Cencio

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1150¹BornRoma
20 Feb 119343.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea
20 Feb 119343.1Elevated to Cardinal
1200²50.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
18 Jul 121666.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
24 Jul 121666.6Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Mar 122777.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cencio :
Pope Cencio (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
  • a cardinal for 23.4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1193
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014