Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Celestine III

Giacinto Bobone

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1105¹BornRome
1144²39.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
1144²39.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 119186.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
13 Apr 119186.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 119186.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Jan 119893.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Bobone:
Pope Giacinto Bobone (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 6.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
  • a cardinal for 47.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 6.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 4 Mar 2014