Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Francis Prevost, O.S.A.

Bishop of Chiclayo, Peru

Apostolic Administrator of Callao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1955 Born
2 Sep 197822.9ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
29 Aug 198125.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
19 Jun 198226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
14 Sep 200146.0AppointedSuperior General of Order of St. Augustine
4 Sep 201357.9CeasedSuperior General of Order of St. Augustine
3 Nov 201459.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chiclayo, Peru
3 Nov 201459.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufar
7 Nov 201459.1InstalledApostolic Administrator of Chiclayo, Peru
12 Dec 201459.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufar
26 Sep 201560.0AppointedBishop of Chiclayo, Peru
15 Apr 202064.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Callao, Peru

MicroData Summary for Robert Francis Prevost
Bishop Robert Francis Prevost O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Chiclayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chiclayo, Diocese of Chiclayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiclayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2014
  • i/ob: CB, 4 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 7 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 14 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,326
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast