Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Celestine IV

Goffredo Castiglioni

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note/Previous Titular See: (never crowned as Pope)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1180¹Born
18 Sep 122747.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 Sep 122747.7Elevated to Cardinal
1239²59.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
25 Oct 124161.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Nov 124161.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Goffredo Castiglioni
Pope Goffredo Castiglioni (born 1180, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a cardinal for 14.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for -.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast