Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Urban V

Bl. Guillaume Grimoard, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1310BornGrizac
28 Sep 136252.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Nov 136252.8Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Dec 137060.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Mar 1870Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Guillaume Grimoard:
Pope Bl. Guillaume Grimoard O.S.B. (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
  • a pope for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014