Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Marcellus II

Marcello Cervini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1501Born
1535²33.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 153938.3AppointedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
19 Dec 153938.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 Sep 154039.3AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
5 Nov 154039.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
29 Feb 154442.8AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
24 May 155049.0AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
9 Apr 155553.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Apr 155553.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 May 155553.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcello Cervini (VIAF: 42633089)
Pope Marcello Cervini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefano, Diocese of Macerata
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 20.3 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256, and Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast